US SB178 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-10 - Cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to S. 178 with an amendment (SA 2652) not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 168. (CR S5532-5533)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

UIGHUR Act of 2019 Uighur Intervention and Global Humanitarian Unified Response Act of 2019 This bill directs the President to impose sanctions and export restrictions related to China's treatment of the Uyghurs, a predominantly Muslim Turkic ethnic group. The President shall report to Congress a list of senior Chinese government officials who are engaged in or responsible for serious human rights abuses, including mass incarceration and political indoctrination, against Turkic Muslims in China's Xinjiang Uyghur Autonomous Region. The President shall impose visa- and property-blocking sanctions on such individuals. The President may waive the imposition of such sanctions on U.S. national interest grounds. The President shall identify items that provide China with a critical capability to suppress basic human rights, including items that provide capability to (1) conduct surveillance, (2) monitor and restrict an individual's movement, (3) monitor and restrict access to the internet, and (4) identify individuals through facial or voice recognition. The President shall (1) place such items on the Commerce Control List (a list of items subject to export controls); and (2) require authorization for the export, reexport, or transfer of such items to or within China. The bill terminates certain prohibitions, such as a prohibition against obligating funds for U.S. Trade and Development Agency activities in China, upon a report by the President to Congress that China has taken specified actions, including ending the mass internment of Turkic Muslims in Xinjiang. The Department of State shall report to Congress on human rights abuses in Xinjiang, including an assessment of the number of individuals detained in forced labor camps.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UIGHUR Act of 2019 Uighur Intervention and Global Humanitarian Unified Response Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-10 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to S. 178 with an amendment (SA 2652) RC# 168 (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Motion to proceed to consideration of House message to accompany S. 178 RC# 153 (Y: 47 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 644 (Y: 407 N: 1 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-10HouseCloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to S. 178 with an amendment (SA 2652) not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 168. (CR S5532-5533)
2020-09-08HouseCloture motion on the motion to concur in the House amendment to S. 178 with an amendment (SA 2652) presented in Senate.
2020-09-08HouseS.Amdt.2652 Amendment SA 2652 proposed by Senator McConnell. (consideration: CR S5433, text: CR S5448-5476) To provide for a complete substitute.
2020-09-08HouseMotion by Senator McConnell to concur in the House amendment to S. 178 with an amendment (SA 2652) made in Senate. (CR S5433)
2020-09-08HouseS.Amdt.2499 Proposed amendment SA 2499 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S5433)
2020-09-08HouseMotion by Senator McConnell to concur in the House amendment to S. 178 with an amendment (SA 2499) withdrawn.
2020-09-08HouseS.Amdt.2499 Considered by Senate (Message from the House considered). (consideration: CR S5433)
2020-09-08HouseConsidered by Senate (Message from the House considered). (consideration: CR S5433)
2020-07-30HouseS.Amdt.2499 Amendment SA 2499 proposed by Senator McConnell. (consideration: CR S4618; text: CR S4618) In the nature of a substitute.
2020-07-30HouseMotion by Senator McConnell to concur in the House amendment to S. 178 with an amendment (SA 2499) made in Senate. (CR S4618)
2020-07-30HouseMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S4618-4622)
2020-07-30HouseMotion to proceed to consideration of the House message to accompany S. 178 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 42. Record Vote Number: 153. (CR S4617)
2019-12-04HouseMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
2019-12-03HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-12-03HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 1 (Roll no. 644). (text: CR H9201-9203)
2019-12-03HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9209)
2019-12-03HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-12-03HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 178.
2019-12-03HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9201-9208)
2019-12-03HouseMr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-30HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-10-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-12HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-09-12HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-09-12HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-09-12HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-09-12HouseReceived in the House.
2019-09-11SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5450-5452; text: CR S5450-5452)
2019-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 99.
2019-06-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2019-05-22SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-01-17SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB649 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB2972 (Related) 2019-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects

Alliances
Asia
Business ethics
China
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of State
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Foreign and international corporations
Government information and archives
Human rights
Human trafficking
Industrial facilities
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Labor standards
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
News media and reporting
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Right of privacy
Sanctions
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
United Nations
Visas and passports
Wages and earnings

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback