US SB176 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
W21 Water in the 21st Century Act This bill establishes within the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) a WaterSense program to identify, label, and promote water efficient products, buildings, landscapes, facilities, processes, and services. This bill establishes a program to provide financial incentives for consumers to purchase and install products, buildings, landscapes, facilities, processes, and services labeled under the WaterSense program. The EPA is required to make grants to owners or operators of water systems to address any ongoing or forecasted impact of climate change on a region's water quality or quantity. The Department of the Interior may: (1) provide financial assistance to water projects in specified states, including projects for water recycling, water infrastructure, enhanced energy efficiency, desalination, and water storage and conveyance; and (2) transfer to nonfederal entities title to any reclamation projects or facility in need of rehabilitation that are authorized before enactment of this Act. The U.S. Geological Survey must establish an open water data system to advance the availability, timely distribution, and widespread use of water data and information for water management, education, research, assessment, and monitoring purposes. This bill reauthorizes through FY2020 the Water Desalination Act of 1996 and water resources research and technology institutes under the Water Resources Research Act of 1984. After receiving a request from a nonfederal sponsor, the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers must review the operation of a reservoir and, if appropriate, update the water control manual to incorporate improved weather and runoff forecasting methods. The EPA is required to develop voluntary national drought resilience guidelines relating to preparedness planning and investments for water users and providers. The U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service must prepare a salmon drought plan for California.
Title
W21 Water in the 21st Century Act
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB291 (Same As) 2015-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
HB813 (Related) 2015-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB653 (Related) 2015-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
HB4497 (Related) 2016-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
HB813 (Related) 2015-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB653 (Related) 2015-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
HB4497 (Related) 2016-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Arizona
Atmospheric science and weather
California
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Colorado
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Fishes
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing industry and standards
Idaho
Kansas
Land transfers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Montana
Nebraska
Nevada
New Mexico
North Dakota
Oklahoma
Oregon
Research administration and funding
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
South Dakota
Texas
Utah
Washington State
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Wyoming
Arizona
Atmospheric science and weather
California
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Colorado
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Fishes
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing industry and standards
Idaho
Kansas
Land transfers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Montana
Nebraska
Nevada
New Mexico
North Dakota
Oklahoma
Oregon
Research administration and funding
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
South Dakota
Texas
Utah
Washington State
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Wyoming
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/176/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s176/BILLS-114s176is.pdf |