US SB1693 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-27)
Status: Introduced on August 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 292.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Stop Enabling Sex Traffickers Act of 2017 (Sec. 3) This bill amends the Communications Act of 1934 to specify that communications decency provisions protecting providers from liability for the private blocking or screening of offensive material shall not be construed to impair or limit civil action or criminal prosecution under state or federal criminal or civil laws relating to sex trafficking of children or sex trafficking by force, fraud, or coercion. (Sec. 4) The bill amends the federal criminal code to specify that the violation for benefiting from "participation in a venture" engaged in sex trafficking of children, or sex trafficking by force, fraud, or coercion, includes knowingly assisting, supporting, or facilitating the violation. (Sec. 5) The bill amends the federal criminal code to allow a state attorney general to bring a civil action in U.S. district court on behalf of the state's residents if the attorney general believes an interest of the residents has been or is threatened or adversely affected by any person who knowingly participates in the sex trafficking of children or sex trafficking by force, fraud, or coercion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stop Enabling Sex Traffickers Act of 2017

Sponsors

Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]Sen. John McCain [R-AZ]Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO]
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX]Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND]Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN]Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX]
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ]Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC]Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT]Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL]Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK]Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]
Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK]Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA]Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE]
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC]
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL]Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC]Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR]Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA]
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA]Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA]
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI]Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ]Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY]Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA]
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA]Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]
Sen. John Thune [R-SD]Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV]Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI]
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA]Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT]Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY]
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]Sen. Richard Shelby [R-AL]Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD]Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS]
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS]Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV]
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE]Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT]Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL]
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK]Sen. David Perdue [R-GA]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 292.
2018-01-10SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-199.
2017-11-08SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2017-09-19SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Hearings held.
2017-08-01SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4670-4671)

Same As/Similar To

HB1865 (Related) 2018-04-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-164. (TXT | PDF)
HR748 (Similar To) 2018-02-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback