US SB1689 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to permit States to transfer certain funds from the clean water revolving fund of a State to the drinking water revolving fund of the State in certain circumstances, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to permit States to transfer certain funds from the clean water revolving fund of a State to the drinking water revolving fund of the State in certain circumstances, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10HouseHeld at the desk.
2019-09-10HouseReceived in the House.
2019-09-10SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-09-09SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5367; text: CR S5367)
2019-07-23SenateStar Print ordered on report 116-63.
2019-07-23SenateBy Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-63.
2019-06-19SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 125.
2019-06-19SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
2019-06-19SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-05-23SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback