US SB1668 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-260. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-260. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to rename a waterway in the State of New York as the "Joseph Sanford Jr. Channel". This bill redesignates the waterway in New York State known as the Negro Bar Channel as the "Joseph Sanford Jr. Channel."
Title
A bill to rename a waterway in the State of New York as the "Joseph Sanford Jr. Channel".
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-09 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-260. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-10-09 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-09-28 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-26 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9060) |
2018-09-26 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9060) |
2018-09-26 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2018-09-26 | House | Mr. Shuster asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-08-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-08-03 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-08-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5560; text: CR S5560) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 369. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-221. |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-07-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4331) |
Same As/Similar To
HB6125 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.