US SB1632 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-266.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-266.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require a regional strategy to address the threat posed by Boko Haram. (Sec. 1) This bill requires: the Department of State and the Department of Defense to develop jointly and submit to Congress a five-year strategy to help Nigeria, members of the Multinational Joint Task Force to Combat Boko Haram, and relevant partners to counter Boko Haram, and to assist Nigeria and its neighbors to address legitimate grievances of vulnerable populations in areas affected by Boko Haram; and the Director of National Intelligence to assess the willingness and capability Nigeria and regional partners to implement such strategy. Such strategy must address the following elements: enhancing the institutional capacity, including military capabilities, of Nigeria and partner nations in the region to counter Boko Haram; providing humanitarian support to civilian populations impacted by Boko Haram; improving the capacity of Multinational Joint Task Force to Combat Boko Haram partner nations to investigate and prosecute human rights abuses by security forces and promote respect for the rule of law within the military; assisting Nigeria and Multinational Joint Task Force to Combat Boko Haram nations to counter violent extremism; strengthening the rule of law and Nigeria's capacity to enhance school security; and identifying the resources required to achieve such objectives. It is the sense of Congress that lack of economic opportunity and access to education, justice, and other social services contributes to Boko Haram's ability to radicalize and recruit individuals.
Title
A bill to require a regional strategy to address the threat posed by Boko Haram.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-266. |
2016-12-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-12-12 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-07 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7328) |
2016-12-07 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7328) |
2016-12-07 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2016-12-07 | House | Committee on Intelligence (Permanent) discharged. |
2016-12-07 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to House Intelligence (Permanent) |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-09-24 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-09-24 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6905-6906) |
2015-09-22 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6905) |
2015-09-22 | Senate | S.Amdt.2677 Amendment SA 2677 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-09-22 | Senate | S.Amdt.2677 Amendment SA 2677 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Lankford. (consideration: CR S6905; text: CR S6905) |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6905-6906; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S6905) |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 175. |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3833 (Related) 2016-09-22 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Subjects
Africa
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Economic development
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Nigeria
Rule of law and government transparency
Terrorism
United Nations
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Economic development
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Nigeria
Rule of law and government transparency
Terrorism
United Nations