US SB163 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Full Faith and Credit Act - Requires the authority of the Department of the Treasury to pay the principal and interest on debt held by the public to take priority over all other obligations incurred by the government in the event the federal debt reaches the statutory limit.
Title
Full Faith and Credit Act
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] |
Sen. Daniel Coats [R-IN] | Sen. Tom Coburn [R-OK] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Jim DeMint [R-SC] |
Sen. John Ensign [R-NV] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-26 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 2. |
2011-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
SB259 (Related) 2011-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB421 (Same As) 2011-01-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB568 (Related) 2011-02-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB421 (Same As) 2011-01-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB568 (Related) 2011-02-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/163/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s163/BILLS-112s163pcs.pdf |