US SB1602 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 375.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 375.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Finger Lakes National Heritage Area Study Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior to assess the suitability and feasibility of designating specified counties and other areas in the state of New York as the Finger Lakes National Heritage Area.
Title
Finger Lakes National Heritage Area Study Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 375. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-227. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
HB6307 (Related) 2018-07-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
HB6307 (Related) 2018-07-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Subjects
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Lakes and rivers
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
Historic sites and heritage areas
Lakes and rivers
New York State
Public lands and natural resources