US SB16 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit taking minors across State lines in circumvention of laws requiring the involvement of parents in abortion decisions.
Title
Child Custody Protection Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB627 (Related) 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB109 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2223 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB109 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2223 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/16/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s16/BILLS-117s16is.pdf |