US SB1539 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Domestic Violence and Stalking Victims Act of 2017 This bill amends the federal criminal code to: state that the term "intimate partner" includes a dating partner and any other person subject to a protection order under state domestic or family violence law; and expand the term "misdemeanor crime of domestic violence" to include the use or attempted use of physical force, or the threatened use of a deadly weapon, by a current or former intimate partner. The bill makes it a crime to knowingly sell or dispose of a firearm to a person who has been convicted of a misdemeanor crime of stalking. It also makes it a crime for such convicted stalker to receive or possess a firearm.
Title
Protecting Domestic Violence and Stalking Victims Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3207 (Related) 2017-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB5410 (Related) 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB6545 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB5410 (Related) 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB6545 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Domestic violence and child abuse
Firearms and explosives
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Domestic violence and child abuse
Firearms and explosives
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1539/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1539/BILLS-115s1539is.pdf |