US SB1536 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-99. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-99. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Combating Human Trafficking in Commercial Vehicles Act
Title
Combating Human Trafficking in Commercial Vehicles Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 695 (Y: 418 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-99. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-01-03 | House | Signed by President. |
2017-12-22 | House | Presented to President. |
2017-12-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 1 (Roll no. 695). (text: CR H10218-10219) |
2017-12-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10229-10230) |
2017-12-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-12-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1536. |
2017-12-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10218-10220) |
2017-12-19 | House | Mr. Graves (MO) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-10-23 | House | By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 115-177. |
2017-09-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2017-09-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-09-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5771-5772; text: CR S5771-5772) |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 204. |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3813 (Related) 2017-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 346.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Transportation
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Human trafficking
Licensing and registrations
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Transportation
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Human trafficking
Licensing and registrations
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security