US SB152 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 342.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 342.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Keep the Promise Act of 2015 (Sec. 4) This bill restricts gaming on land within the Phoenix, Arizona, metropolitan area acquired by the Department of the Interior in trust for the benefit of an Indian tribe after April 9, 2013. The restriction ends on January 1, 2027.
Title
Keep the Promise Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] |
Roll Calls
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 263 N: 146 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 342. |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. With written report No. 114-199. Additional views filed. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB308 (Same As) 2015-11-16 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 263 - 146 (Roll no. 626).