US SB151 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Indian Arts and Crafts Amendments Act of 2009 - Amends the Indian Arts and Crafts Act of 1990 to expand the authority of the Indian Arts and Crafts Board to bring criminal and civil actions for offenses under such Act involving the sale of misrepresented Indian produced goods or products. Authorizes: (1) any federal law enforcement officer to conduct an investigation of an alleged violation of this Act occurring within the jurisdiction of the United States; and (2) the Indian Arts and Crafts Board to refer an alleged violation to any federal law enforcement officer (currently, only to the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)) for investigation. Permits federal law enforcement officers to investigate an alleged violation regardless of whether the Board makes a referral of an alleged violation. Requires the findings of any investigation of an alleged violation to be submitted to a federal or state prosecuting authority or the Indian Arts and Crafts Board. Authorizes the Board, upon receiving the findings of such an investigation, to: (1) recommend to the Attorney General that criminal proceedings be initiated (current law); (2) provide such support to the Attorney General relating to the criminal proceedings as the Attorney General determines to be appropriate; or (3) recommend, in lieu of, or in addition to, any such criminal proceeding, that the Attorney General initiate a civil action. Allows the Attorney General, an Indian tribe, an Indian, or an Indian arts and crafts organization to initiate a civil action under this Act. Amends the federal criminal code to revise penalties for the sale of misrepresented Indian produced goods and products.
Title
Indian Arts and Crafts Amendments Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Byron Dorgan [D-ND] | Sen. Jon Kyl [R-AZ] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-19 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2009-07-24 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2009-07-24 | Referred to House Natural Resources | |
2009-07-24 | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | |
2009-07-24 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-07-24 | Received in the House. | |
2009-07-24 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8100-8101; text as passed Senate: CR S8100-8101) | |
2009-07-22 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 124. | |
2009-07-22 | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Dorgan without amendment. Without written report. | |
2009-04-30 | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2009-01-06 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. | |
2009-01-06 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S137) |
Same As/Similar To
HB725 (Same As) 2010-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 111-211.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Historical and cultural resources
Native Americans
Consumer affairs
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Historical and cultural resources
Native Americans