US SB1502 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Became Public Law No: 117-60.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Became Public Law No: 117-60.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to make Federal law enforcement officer peer support communications confidential, and for other purposes.
Title
COPS Counseling Act Confidentiality Opportunities for Peer Support Counseling Act
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 424 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-60. |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2021-10-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 3 (Roll no. 337). (text: CR H5944) |
2021-10-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5953-5954) |
2021-10-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-10-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1502. |
2021-10-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5944-5948) |
2021-10-27 | House | Ms. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-06-11 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-06-11 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S3965-3966) |
2021-06-07 | Senate | S.Amdt.2115 Amendment SA 2115 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Cortez Masto. (consideration: CR S3965-3966; text: CR S3965-3966) In the nature of a substitute. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | S.Amdt.2115 Amendment SA 2115 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3965-3966) |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3070 (Related) 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.