US SB150 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Biennial Budgeting and Appropriations Act Amends the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 to require biennial (currently, annual) budget resolutions, biennial appropriations Acts, and biennial government strategic and performance plans. States that budget biennium is the two consecutive fiscal years beginning on October 1 of any odd-numbered year. Requires the Office of Management and Budget to report to Congress on the impact and feasibility of changing the definition of a fiscal year and the budget process based on that definition to a two-year fiscal period.
Title
Biennial Budgeting and Appropriations Act
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] |
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-04 | Senate | Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S202) |
Same As/Similar To
SB385 (Related) 2015-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
HB1456 (Related) 2015-03-18 - Referred to House Rules
HB1456 (Related) 2015-03-18 - Referred to House Rules
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget process
Economics and public finance
Financial crises and stabilization
Homeland security
Performance measurement
Veterans' medical care
Budget process
Economics and public finance
Financial crises and stabilization
Homeland security
Performance measurement
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/150/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s150/BILLS-114s150is.pdf |