US SB15 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 191.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Federal Trade Commission to report on, and increase awareness regarding, scams targeting older adults. Specifically, the commission must report on the number and type of scams that target older adults and provide policy recommendations to prevent such scams; revise the commission's web portal with current information about such scams, including contact information for law enforcement and adult protective services agencies; and coordinate with media outlets and law enforcement to disseminate such information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Seniors from Emergency Scams Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-16SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 191.
2021-12-16SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell without amendment. Without written report.
2021-04-28SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-01-22SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB446 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback