US SB1493 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-26 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-26 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to increase, as of December 1, 2015, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children. Requires each such increase to be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date. Directs the VA to publish the increased amounts in the Federal Register. Authorizes the VA to adjust administratively, consistent with the increases made by this Act, the rates of disability compensation payable to persons who have not received compensation for a service-connected disability.
Title
Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | House | Held at the desk. |
2015-10-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7476: text as passed Senate: CR S7476) |
2015-08-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 202. |
2015-08-28 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Isakson under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2015 without amendment. With written report No. 114-122. |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB675 (Related) 2015-07-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB3032 (Related) 2016-06-29 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
SB3032 (Related) 2016-06-29 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation