US SB145 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 204.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 204.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Park Access Act (Sec. 3) Requires the Director of the National Park Service to refund to each state all of the funds that it used to reopen and temporarily operate a unit of the National Park System during the period in October 2013 in which there was a lapse in appropriations for that unit. Funds of the National Park Service appropriated after the enactment of this Act shall be used to carry out this Act.
Title
National Park Access Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 204. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-124. |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-338. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Appropriations
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Intergovernmental relations
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Intergovernmental relations
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance