US SB1405 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Ambulance Access Act of 2013 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to extend through December 31, 2018, certain temporary increases in rates (add-on payments) for ground and super rural ambulance services.
Title
Medicare Ambulance Access Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1871 (Related) 2014-01-16 - By Senator Baucus from Committee on Finance filed written report. Report No. 113-135.
SB2110 (Related) 2014-03-12 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 327.
SB2122 (Related) 2014-03-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 330.
SB2110 (Related) 2014-03-12 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 327.
SB2122 (Related) 2014-03-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 330.
Subjects
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health care coverage and access
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
Health care coverage and access
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1405/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1405/BILLS-113s1405is.pdf |