US SB1403 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-09 - By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 114-398.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-09 - By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 114-398.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Florida Fisheries Improvement Act This bill amends the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act (MSA) to revise requirements for fishery management in the Gulf of Mexico and the South Atlantic. Regional fishery management councils may use alternative fishery management measures in a recreational fishery. This bill revises requirements for fishery management plans, including by exempting certain species from fishery rebuilding requirements, changing how to determine the timelines for rebuilding fisheries, and repealing the requirement for plans to contain catch limits for red snapper. Funds received as fines, penalties, and forfeitures of property for violations of marine resource law may be used for the cost of stock assessments, surveys, and data collection on fisheries. A citizen owning or leasing an eligible fishery facility may make an agreement with the Department of Commerce to establish a capital construction fund to provide for the acquisition, construction, or reconstruction of a qualified facility. Commerce must make a decision on whether there is a commercial fishery failure because of a fishery resource disaster within 90 days of a receiving a complete estimate of the economic impact of the disaster. The Gulf of Mexico Fishery Management Council and the South Atlantic Council must review, at least every five years, the allocation of fishing privileges. Councils may delay the review for three one-year periods. Commerce must: (1) arrange for the National Academy of Sciences to study the process of allocating fishing privileges; (2) develop and publish a plan to conduct stock assessments for all stocks of fish for which a MSA fishery management plan is in effect, unless the assessment is not necessary; and (3) report on facilitating greater incorporation of data, analysis, stock assessments, and surveys from nongovernmental sources.
Title
Florida Fisheries Improvement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-09 | Senate | By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 114-398. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 697. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Atlantic Ocean
Capital gains tax
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic performance and conditions
Fishes
Florida
Government studies and investigations
Gulf of Mexico
Legislative rules and procedure
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Atlantic Ocean
Capital gains tax
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic performance and conditions
Fishes
Florida
Government studies and investigations
Gulf of Mexico
Legislative rules and procedure
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding