US SB140 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-74.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addresses data collection and monitoring of the Great Lakes, oceans, bays, estuaries, and coasts. Specifically, it expands requirements related to a study of the scientific workforce in areas of oceanic and atmospheric research and development. For example, the bill requires the study to include an investigation on whether there is a workforce shortage in the number of individuals with technical or trade-based skillsets or credentials suited to a career in oceanic and atmospheric data collection, processing, satellite production, or satellite operations. The study must also investigate actions the federal government can take to increase diversity in the scientific workforce and shorten the hiring backlog for such workforce. The bill also directs the National Oceanic Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to create an Electronic Monitoring Innovation Prize, which may be awarded for the development of advanced electronic fisheries monitoring equipment and data analysis tools. NOAA must also seek to enter into an agreement with the National Academy of Sciences to evaluate whether there is a need for an Advanced Research Projects Agency-Oceans within NOAA. Additionally, NOAA must establish a program to improve the collection, aggregation, and analysis of data to measure the value and impact of industries related to the Great Lakes, oceans, bays, estuaries, and coasts on the U.S. economy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BLUE GLOBE Act Bolstering Long-term Understanding and Exploration of the Great Lakes, Oceans, Bays, and Estuaries Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-15SenateBy Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-74.
2021-12-17SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 206.
2021-12-17SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2021-05-12SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2021-01-28SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB3748 (Same As) 2021-06-22 - Committee Hearings Held.

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Economic performance and conditions
Employee hiring
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Fishes
Genetics
Geography and mapping
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Great Lakes
International organizations and cooperation
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Mining
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Outdoor recreation
Performance measurement
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Solid waste and recycling
Spacecraft and satellites
Technology transfer and commercialization
Travel and tourism
Water quality

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback