US SB1395 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to revise the boundaries of certain John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System units in Delaware. (Sec. 1) This bill modifies certain boundaries of the John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System Units located in Sussex County, Delaware.
Title
A bill to revise the boundaries of certain John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System units in Delaware.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-01-25 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S471; text: CR S471) |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 214. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. With written report No. 115-149. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3688-3689; text of measure as introduced: CR S3689) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4880 (Related) 2018-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Delaware
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores