US SB1358 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) to use funds made available under provisions of the Act commonly known as the Trademark Act of 1946 (relating to fees) to support the processing of patents and other activities, services, and materials relating to patents, notwithstanding provisions restricting the use of such fees to activities relating trademark registrations, if: (1) the Director certifies to Congress that the use of such funds is reasonably necessary to avoid USPTO furloughs or a reduction-in-force, or both; and (2) funds so used are repaid to trademark operations not later than September 30, 2011. Terminates such authority on June 30, 2010.
Title
A bill to authorize the Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office to use funds made available under the Trademark Act of 1946 for patent operations in order to avoid furloughs and reductions-in-force.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-25 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. | |
2009-06-25 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-06-25 | Received in the House. | |
2009-06-25 | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7044-7046; text as passed Senate: CR S7044) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3114 (Related) 2009-08-07 - Became Public Law No: 111-45.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Intellectual property
User charges and fees