US SB1353 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 669.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 669.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to promote United States values and fulfill agency missions through the use of innovative applied artificial intelligence technologies, and for other purposes.
Title
Advancing American AI Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 669. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-270. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB4552 (Related) 2022-09-21 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.