US SB1351 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 118-194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 118-194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to study and prevent child abuse in youth residential programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Stop Institutional Child Abuse Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Tommy Tuberville [R-AL] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Pete Ricketts [R-NE] |
Sen. Katie Boyd Britt [R-AL] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. John Fetterman [D-PA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
Roll Calls
2024-12-18 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass RC# 512 (Y: 373 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-23 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 118-194. |
2024-12-23 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2024-12-23 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2024-12-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-12-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 373 - 33 (Roll no. 512). (text: 12/17/2024 CR H7278-7279) |
2024-12-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7339-7340) |
2024-12-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-12-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1351. |
2024-12-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7278-7281) |
2024-12-17 | House | Mr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-12-12 | House | Held at the desk. |
2024-12-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2024-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-12-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S6973-6974) |
2024-12-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.3316 Amendment SA 3316 proposed by Senator Merkley. (consideration: CR S6952) |
2024-12-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.3316 Amendment SA 3316 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-12-11 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6952) |
2024-12-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2955 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.