US SB1349 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
NOTICE Act Notice of Observation Treatment and Implication for Care Eligibility Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to require a hospital or critical access hospital with an agreement with the Secretary of Health and Human Services to give each individual who receives observation services as an outpatient for more than 24 hours an adequate oral and written notification within 36 hours after beginning to receive them which: explains the individual's status as an outpatient and not as an inpatient and the reasons why; explains the implications of that status on services furnished (including those furnished as an inpatient), in particular the implications for cost-sharing requirements and subsequent coverage eligibility for services furnished by a skilled nursing facility; includes appropriate additional information; is written and formatted using plain language and made available in appropriate languages; and is signed by the individual or a person acting on the individual's behalf (representative) to acknowledge receipt of the notification, or if the individual or representative refuses to sign, the written notification is signed by the hospital staff who presented it.
Title
NOTICE Act Notice of Observation Treatment and Implication for Care Eligibility Act
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186. |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment. With written report No. 114-107. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB876 (Related) 2015-08-06 - Became Public Law No: 114-42. (TXT | PDF)