US SB134 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require an annual budget estimate for the initiatives of the National Institutes of Health pursuant to reports and recommendations made under the National Alzheimer's Project Act.
Title
Alzheimer’s Accountability and Investment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Sen. J.D. Vance [R-OH] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183. |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Sanders without amendment. Without written report. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S150-151) |
Same As/Similar To
HB620 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 0.