US SB134 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-249.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-249.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 2) increases the maximum prison term for a stalking offense, if the victim is under 18 years of age. (Sec. 3) The Department of Justice must report on best practices for enforcing laws related to stalking.
Title
Combat Online Predators Act
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-249. |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7011-7012) |
2020-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 134. |
2020-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7011-7014) |
2020-12-08 | House | Mr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-10-29 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-28 | Senate | S.Amdt.1196 Amendment SA 1196 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-28 | Senate | S.Amdt.1196 Amendment SA 1196 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Toomey. (consideration: CR S6204; text: CR S6204) In the nature of a substitute. |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6204) |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB570 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1585 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 66.
SB2843 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6569)
SB2920 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 308.
HB1585 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 66.
SB2843 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6569)
SB2920 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 308.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local government operations
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local government operations