US SB134 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-04 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-04 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Spoofing Prevention Act of 2017 (Sec. 3) This bill amends the Communications Act of 1934 to expand the prohibition against knowingly transmitting misleading or inaccurate caller identification information to apply to: (1) persons outside the United States if the recipient of the call is within the United States, and (2) text messages. Existing caller identification requirements that apply to calls made using a telecommunications service or IP-enabled voice service are revised to apply to: (1) services that furnish voice communications using resources from the North American Numbering Plan; and (2) transmissions from a telephone facsimile machine, computer, or other device to a telephone facsimile machine. The Federal Communications Commission (FCC) must collaborate with the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) to regularly update education materials that help consumers identify: (1) scams and fraudulent activity that rely upon misleading or inaccurate caller identification information, and (2) existing technologies that consumers can use to protect against such fraud. The Government Accountability Office must report on: (1) actions taken, or actions that could be taken, by the FCC or the FTC to combat the fraudulent provision of misleading or inaccurate caller identification information; and (2) any recommendations to combat the fraudulent provision of such information.
Title
Spoofing Prevention Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-04 | House | Held at the desk. |
2017-08-04 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4817-4818; text: CR S4817-4818) |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 117. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-91. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S317-318) |
Same As/Similar To
HB423 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication