US SB1321 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to modify the boundary of the Casa Grande Ruins National Monument, and for other purposes.
Title
Casa Grande Ruins National Monument Boundary Modification Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 497. |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment. With written report No. 117-154. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB803 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.