US SB1321 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-179. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-179. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Broadens the definition of protected computer, for purposes of computer fraud and abuse offenses, to include a computer that is part of a voting system.
Title
Defending the Integrity of Voting Systems Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-179. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-10-09 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4581) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1321. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4581-4582) |
2020-09-21 | House | Ms. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-07-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-07-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4915; text: CR S4915) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 95. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB482 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 389.
HB3238 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3238 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Crime and law enforcement
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Crime and law enforcement
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes