US SB1319 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to make certain staffing and quality of care data publicly available on a specified VA website. Among other elements, the information published on the website should include statistics related to patient wait times, effectiveness of care, and staffing and vacancy information. The website must be (1) directly accessible from the main VA website and the main websites of each VA medical center, and (2) understandable and usable by the general public. The VA must implement a self-auditing process to assess the accuracy and completeness of the data available on the website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VA Quality Health Care Accountability and Transparency Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-28SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-06-23SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
2021-04-22SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB2775 (Same As) 2021-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback