US SB1309 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Combating Global Corruption Act of 2019 This bill requires the Department of State to develop a program to combat corruption in countries that receive U.S. aid. The State Department shall annually report to Congress a tiered list of all countries that receive certain U.S. foreign assistance. The first tier shall contain countries that meet minimum standards for combatting public corruption, while the second tier shall contain countries that do not comply but are making significant efforts to do so. Third-tier countries do not meet the minimum anti-corruption standards and are not making significant efforts to do so. For each second- and third-tier ranked country, the State Department shall (1) include a corruption risk assessment and mitigation strategy in each country's integrated country strategy, and (2) use appropriate anti-corruption mechanisms. Such mechanisms include requiring the disclosure of the beneficial ownership of contractors and partners involved in State Department programs and requiring claw-back provisions to recover misappropriated funds. The State Department shall designate an anti-corruption point of contact in the U.S. diplomatic post in each second- or third-tier country and where the State Department determines that such a point of contact is necessary. The point of contact shall be responsible for coordinating a whole-of-government approach to enhancing the ability of foreign countries to combat public corruption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Combating Global Corruption Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-12-23HouseReceived in the House.
2019-12-23SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-12-19SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2019-12-19SenateS.Amdt.1275 Amendment SA 1275 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2019-12-19SenateS.Amdt.1275 Amendment SA 1275 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR S7236; text: CR S7220-7221) In the nature of a substitute.
2019-12-19SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
2019-12-19SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7234-7236)
2019-07-11SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 144.
2019-07-11SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2019-06-25SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-05-02SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback