US SB1289 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Commerce to conduct a biennial assessment and analysis regarding the contribution of the digital economy to the U.S. economy.
Title
Measuring the Economic Impact of Broadband Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-06-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3267) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3267) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3676 (Same As) 2019-07-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Digital media
Economic performance and conditions
Educational technology and distance education
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Digital media
Economic performance and conditions
Educational technology and distance education
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications