US SB1282 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-181.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-181.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to redesignate certain clinics of the Department of Veterans Affairs located in Montana. (Sec. 1) This bill redesignates Department of Veterans Affairs clinics in Montana located at: 2687 Palmer Street in Missoula as the "David J. Thatcher VA Clinic," 1775 Spring Creek Lane in Billings as the "Dr. Joseph Medicine Crow VA Clinic," and 1766 Majestic Lane in Billings as the "Benjamin Charles Steele VA Clinic." Any local public display of the name of the Dr. Joseph Medicine Crow Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic carried out by the United States or through the use of federal funds shall include both the English name, Dr. Joseph Medicine Crow, and the Crow name, Dakaak Baako.
Title
A bill to redesignate certain clinics of the Department of Veterans Affairs located in Montana.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-181. |
2018-06-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-05-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4260) |
2018-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1282. |
2018-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4260-4261) |
2018-05-21 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-08-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-08-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-08-04 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.749 Amendment SA 749 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.749 Amendment SA 749 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Daines. (consideration: CR S4716; text: CR S4716) In the nature of a substitute. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4716) |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3221-3222; text of measure as introduced: CR S3222) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3765 (Same As) 2017-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Montana
Veterans' medical care
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Montana
Veterans' medical care