US SB127 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SAFE Act Securing Active and Fair Enforcement Act This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide that the Department of Homeland Security (DHS): (1) shall grant a three-year provisional protected presence to a qualifying alien, (2) may not remove the alien from the United States unless such protected presence is rescinded, and (3) shall provide such alien with employment authorization. An alien is eligible for such protected presence and employment authorization if the alien: (1) was born after June 15, 1981; (2) entered the United States before attaining 16 years of age; (3) continuously resided in the United States since June 15, 2007; (4) was physically but unlawfully present in the United States on June 15; (5) on the date the alien files an application the alien is present in the United States, is enrolled in school or in an education program assisting students in obtaining a high school diploma, has graduated or obtained a certificate of completion from high school or a general educational development certificate, or is an honorably discharged U.S. Coast Guard or Armed Forces veteran; (6) has not been convicted of a felony, a significant misdemeanor, or three or more misdemeanors not occurring on the same date and not arising out of the same act; and (7) does not otherwise pose a threat to national security or a threat to public safety.
Title
SAFE Act Securing Active and Fair Enforcement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB496 (Related) 2017-09-05 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Coffman. Petition No: 115-4. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
SB128 (Related) 2017-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB128 (Related) 2017-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Foreign labor
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judges
Lawyers and legal services
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Foreign labor
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judges
Lawyers and legal services
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/127/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s127/BILLS-115s127is.pdf |