US SB1254 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate and expand wilderness areas in Olympic National Forest in the State of Washington, and to designate certain rivers in Olympic National Forest and Olympic National Park as wild and scenic rivers, and for other purposes.
Title
Wild Olympics Wilderness and Wild and Scenic Rivers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2765 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/1254/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s1254/BILLS-118s1254is.pdf |