US SB1254 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Became Public Law No: 113-124.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Became Public Law No: 113-124.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Harmful Algal Bloom and Hypoxia Research and Control Amendments Act of 2014 - Reauthorizes, revises, and expands the Harmful Algal Bloom and Hypoxia Research and Control Act of 1998. (Sec. 3) Requires the Inter-Agency Task Force on Harmful Algal Blooms and Hypoxia to have a representative from the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC). (Sec. 4) Requires the Under Secretary of Commerce for Oceans and Atmosphere, acting through the Task Force, to: (1) maintain, enhance, and periodically review a national harmful algal bloom and hypoxia program; and (2) develop and submit to Congress a comprehensive research plan and action strategy to address marine and freshwater harmful algal blooms and hypoxia (a condition where low dissolved oxygen in aquatic systems causes stress or death to organisms). Expands the Task Force's functions, including: (1) expediting and coordinating the interagency review process by ensuring timely review and dispersal of required reports and assessments; and (2) promoting the development of new technologies for predicting, monitoring, and mitigating harmful algal bloom and hypoxia conditions. Gives the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) the primary responsibility for administering the Program. Establishes the Under Secretary's duties in administering the program, including the following: preparing work and spending plans; administering grant funding; coordinating with and working with regional, state, and tribal and local government agencies; coordinating with the Secretary of State to support international efforts; identifying additional research, development, and demonstration needs; coordinating and augmenting education programs; providing resources to train state and local coastal and water resource managers; and supporting regional efforts to control and mitigate outbreaks. Requires the Under Secretary to carry out marine and Great Lakes harmful algal bloom and hypoxia events response activities. Requires the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to: (1) research the ecology and impacts of freshwater harmful algal blooms; (2) forecast and monitor event response to freshwater harmful algal blooms in lakes, rivers, estuaries, and reservoirs; and (3) ensure that activities carried under this Act focus on new approaches to addressing freshwater harmful algal blooms and are not duplicative of existing research and development programs authorized by this Act or any other law. (Sec. 7) Requires the Administrator, through the Mississippi River/Gulf of Mexico Watershed Nutrient Task Force, to report to appropriate congressional committees and the President on the progress made by activities directed by the Task Force and carried out or funded by the EPA and other state and federal partners toward attainment of the goals of the Gulf Hypoxia Action Plan 2008 within 12 months after this Act's enactment and biennially thereafter. (Sec. 8) Requires the Task Force to: (1) submit within 18 months to Congress and the President an integrated assessment that examines the causes, consequences, and approaches to reduce hypoxia and harmful algal blooms in the Great Lakes; and (2) develop and submit to Congress a plan, based on the assessment, for reducing, mitigating, and controlling hypoxia and harmful algal blooms.
Title
Harmful Algal Bloom and Hypoxia Research and Control Amendments Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. John Rockefeller [D-WV] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-124. |
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-06-19 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-06-18 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-06-17 | House | Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3771; text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S3771) |
2014-06-10 | House | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2014-06-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5126-5128) |
2014-06-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1254. |
2014-06-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5126-5130) |
2014-06-09 | House | Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-06-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 350. |
2014-06-05 | House | Committee on Natural Resources discharged. |
2014-06-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 113-471, Part I. |
2014-05-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2014-02-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S961-963) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | S.AMDT.2741 Amendment SA 2741 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | S.AMDT.2741 Amendment SA 2741 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Nelson. (consideration: CR S961; text: CR S961)To make a minor technical correction. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S961-963) |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 248. |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller without amendment. With written report No. 113-121. |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Aquatic ecology
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Great Lakes
Gulf of Mexico
Intergovernmental relations
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Mississippi River
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Water quality
Water storage
Watersheds
Aquatic ecology
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Great Lakes
Gulf of Mexico
Intergovernmental relations
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Mississippi River
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Water quality
Water storage
Watersheds