US SB1220 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to recognize and honor the service of individuals who served in the United States Cadet Nurse Corps during World War II, and for other purposes.
Title
United States Cadet Nurse Corps Service Recognition Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-28 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2568 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1220/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1220/BILLS-117s1220is.pdf |