US SB1209 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to increase the amount of special pension for Medal of Honor recipients, and for other purposes. This bill increases the special monthly pension for living Medal of Honor recipients. The Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) shall not make an annual pension increase for such recipients, effective December 1, 2017, if the increased monthly pension under this bill takes effect before such date. If the VA does not make the December 1, 2017 increase, however, annual increases shall resume as of December 1, 2018.
Title
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to increase the amount of special pension for Medal of Honor recipients, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1209/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1209/BILLS-115s1209is.pdf |