US SB1199 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to combat the sexual exploitation of children by supporting victims and promoting accountability and transparency by the tech industry.
Title
Strengthening Transparency and Obligations to Protect Children Suffering from Abuse and Mistreatment Act of 2023 STOP CSAM Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Durbin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1257-1259; text: CR S1259-1271) |
Same As/Similar To
HB7949 (Related) 2024-04-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.