US SB1196 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-66. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-66. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1715 Linnerud Drive in Sun Prairie, Wisconsin, as the "Fire Captain Cory Barr Post Office Building."
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1715 Linnerud Drive in Sun Prairie, Wisconsin, as the "Fire Captain Cory Barr Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-66. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2019-10-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8177) |
2019-10-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1196. |
2019-10-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8177) |
2019-10-16 | House | Mr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-08-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-08-02 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5204; text: CR S5204) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 86. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2277 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
First responders and emergency personnel
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Wisconsin
First responders and emergency personnel
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Wisconsin