US SB1194 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 105.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 105.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to carry out certain activities to improve recycling and composting programs in the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
Recycling and Composting Accountability Act
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 105. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. With written report No. 118-42. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4040 (Related) 2023-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials.