US SB1172 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-136. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-136. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Edward "Ted" Kaufman and Michael Leavitt Presidential Transitions Improvements Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Presidential Transition Act of 1963 to direct the President to plan and coordinate activities to facilitate an efficient transfer of power to a successor President, including by: (1) not later than six months before a presidential election, establishing and operating a White House transition coordinating council; and (2) establishing and operating an agency transition directors council. The General Services Administration (GSA) must designate a senior career appointee to: (1) carry out the duties and authorities of GSA relating to presidential transitions, (2) serve as the Federal Transition Coordinator to coordinate transition planning across agencies; (3) ensure that agencies comply with all statutory requirements relating to transition planning and reporting, and (4) act as a liaison to eligible candidates. Each executive agency shall designate a senior career employee to oversee transition activities. The Federal Transition Coordinator shall: (1) negotiate a memorandum of understanding with the transition representative of each eligible candidate on the conditions of access to employees, facilities, and documents of agencies by transition staff; and (2) submit reports to specified congressional committees on the activities undertaken by the current administration and executive agencies to prepare for the transfer of power to a new President. (Sec. 3) This section requires the President's annual budget request to Congress to include funding for the management and custody of presidential records by the National Archives and Records Administration for each fiscal year in which the term of office of the President will expire. (Sec. 4) This section directs the Office of Personnel Management to submit to specified congressional committees annual reports on requests by agencies to appoint political appointees or former political appointees to nonpolitical civil service positions. These reports shall be submitted quarterly in the last year of a presidential term or in the last year of the second consecutive term of a President. (Sec. 5) This section directs the Government Accountability Office to report to specified congressional committees on final significant regulatory actions promulgated during the last 120-day period of presidential administrations ending in 2001, 2009, and 2017. A significant regulatory action means any regulatory action that is likely to result in a rule that may: (1) have an annual effect on the economy of $100 million or more or adversely affect in a material way the economy, the environment, productivity, competition, jobs, public health or safety, or state, local, or tribal governments or communities; (2) create a serious inconsistency or otherwise interfere with an agency action; (3) materially alter the budgetary impact of entitlements, grants, user fees, or loan programs, or (4) raise novel legal or policy issues. (Sec. 6) This section directs the Department of Homeland Security to submit, not later than February 15, 2016, a report to specified congressional committees analyzing the threats and vulnerabilities facing the United States during a presidential transition.
Title
Edward "Ted" Kaufman and Michael Leavitt Presidential Transitions Improvements Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-136. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-03-18 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-136. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-03-18 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-03-18 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-03-15 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-03-09 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-03-08 | House | Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1349) |
2016-03-01 | House | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2016-02-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-02-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1028-1030) |
2016-02-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1172. |
2016-02-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1028-1031) |
2016-02-29 | House | Mr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-12-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 290. |
2015-12-18 | House | Committee on Homeland Security discharged. |
2015-12-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-384, Part I. |
2015-10-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-10-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-08-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency. |
2015-07-31 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2015-07-31 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2015-07-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-07-31 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-07-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6207-6209) |
2015-07-30 | Senate | S.Amdt.2543 Amendment SA 2543 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-07-30 | Senate | S.Amdt.2543 Amendment SA 2543 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Carper. (consideration: CR S6207; text: CR S6207) |
2015-07-30 | Senate | The committee amendments agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6207; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S6207) |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6205-6209) |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 166. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 114-94. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Federal officials
General Services Administration
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Federal officials
General Services Administration
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents