US SB1168 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Preserving Rehabilitation Innovation Centers Act of 2016 This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to direct the Department of Health and Human Services to conduct a study to assess the costs incurred by rehabilitation innovation centers that are beyond the prospective rates for each of the following activities: (1) furnishing items and services to individuals under Medicare; (2) conducting research; and (3) providing medical training.
Title
Preserving Rehabilitation Innovation Centers Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-12 | House | Held at the desk. |
2016-12-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.5181 Amendment SA 5181 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.5181 Amendment SA 5181 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Kirk. (consideration: CR S7144-7145; text: CR S7145) |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7144-7145) |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2292 (Same As) 2015-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
Rural conditions and development