US SB1116 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-24 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-24 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Indian Community Economic Enhancement Act of 2018 (Sec. 3) This bill amends the Native American Business Development, Trade Promotion, and Tourism Act of 2000 to establish duties for the Office of Native American Business Development (ONABD), including: (1) advising the Department of Commerce regarding the relationship between the United States and Indian tribes; and (2) serving as the point of contact for tribes, tribal organizations, and members of tribes regarding economic development and doing business in Indian lands. Commerce, Interior, and the Department of the Treasury must coordinate to support economic development in Native American communities. The Community Development Financial Institutions Fund assistance benefiting Native American community development financial institutions does not require matching funds. The Government Accountability Office must conduct a study that assesses: (1) current programs and services that assist Native American communities with business and economic development; (2) assistance provided to Native Americans pursuant to loan, bond, and tax incentive programs; and (3) alternative incentives for tribal governments to invest in a Native American community development investment fund or bank. (Sec. 4) This bill amends the Buy Indian Act, including to require the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to use Native American labor and purchase Native American industry products, unless Interior or HHS determines it would be impracticable and unreasonable to do so. (Sec. 5) This bill amends the Native American Programs Act of 1974 to permit the Administration for Native Americans (ANA) to provide financial assistance to certain Native American community development financial institutions. Under the economic opportunity program, ANA must give priority to applicants whose programs seek to develop: (1) tribal codes and court systems relating to economic development, (2) tribal business structures, (3) community development financial institutions, or (4) tribal master plans for community and economic development and infrastructure. When providing technical assistance, ANA must also prioritize those applicants. In addition, the bill reauthorizes through FY2022 certain programs under the Act.
Title
Indian Community Economic Enhancement Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1966-1968) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | S.Amdt.2224 Amendment SA 2224 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | S.Amdt.2224 Amendment SA 2224 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Hoeven. (consideration: CR S1972) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee amendments withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1969-1972) |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 248. |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with amendments. With written report No. 115-174. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4506 (Related) 2018-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 869.
Subjects
Business education
Business investment and capital
Congressional oversight
Credit and credit markets
Department of Commerce
Economic development
Federal-Indian relations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Housing and community development funding
Indian social and development programs
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Minority employment
Native Americans
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Business investment and capital
Congressional oversight
Credit and credit markets
Department of Commerce
Economic development
Federal-Indian relations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Housing and community development funding
Indian social and development programs
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Minority employment
Native Americans
Public contracts and procurement
Small business