US SB1104 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Wireless Access Act of 2017 This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission to establish a consistent methodology for its collection of coverage data about the available speed tiers and performance characteristics of commercial mobile and data service for the Universal Service program or any similar programs.
Title
Rural Wireless Access Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1546 (Related) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
SB1621 (Same As) 2018-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1621 (Same As) 2018-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1104/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1104/BILLS-115s1104is.pdf |