US SB1104 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-162.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-162.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Assessing Progress in Haiti Act of 2014 - Expresses the sense of Congress that transparency, accountability, democracy, and good governance are integral factors in any congressional decision regarding U.S. assistance, including assistance to Haiti. Directs the Secretary of State to report to Congress annually through December 31, 2017, on the status of post-earthquake recovery and development efforts in Haiti. Directs the Secretary, through the Assistant Secretary of State for Western Hemisphere Affairs, to coordinate and transmit to Congress a three-year Haiti strategy that: (1) identifies constraints to economic growth and to consolidation of democratic government institutions; (2) includes an action plan that outlines policy tools, technical assistance, and resources for addressing the highest-priority constraints; and (3) identifies specific steps and benchmarks to provide direct bilateral assistance to the government of Haiti.
Title
Assessing Progress in Haiti Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-162. |
2014-08-08 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-07-29 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-25 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H6837-6838) |
2014-07-25 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6838-6839) |
2014-07-25 | House | Mr. Smith (NJ) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2014-07-14 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-07-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-07-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4434-4435; text as passed Senate: CR S4434-4435) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 447. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-201. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1749 (Related) 2013-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
Subjects
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disaster relief and insurance
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Government studies and investigations
Haiti
Immigration status and procedures
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Latin America
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Reconstruction and stabilization
World health
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disaster relief and insurance
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Government studies and investigations
Haiti
Immigration status and procedures
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Latin America
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Reconstruction and stabilization
World health