US SB1098 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-200.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-200.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to authorize borrowers to separate joint consolidation loans.
Title
Joint Consolidation Loan Separation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - On passage (Y: 232 N: 193 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - On motion to commit (Y: 202 N: 228 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-09-21 - House - On motion to commit (Y: 202 N: 228 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-200. |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-21 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 193 (Roll no. 448). (text: 9/20/2022 CR H7993-7994) |
2022-09-21 | House | On motion to commit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 202 - 228 (Roll no. 447). |
2022-09-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8030-8032) |
2022-09-20 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on the motion to commit and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed Ms. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to commit until a time to be announced. |
2022-09-20 | House | The previous question on the motion to commit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2022-09-20 | House | Ms. Foxx moved to commit to the Committee on Education and Labor. |
2022-09-20 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 1098. |
2022-09-20 | House | Rule provides for consideration of S. 1098 with 1 hour of general debate. Resolution also provides one motion to commit. |
2022-09-20 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1361. (consideration: CR H7993-7998) |
2022-09-20 | House | Rule H. Res. 1361 passed House. |
2022-09-19 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1361 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S. 1098 with 1 hour of general debate. Resolution also provides one motion to commit. |
2022-06-17 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-06-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2961) |
2022-06-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.5097 Amendment SA 5097 proposed by Senator Kelly for Senator Warner. (consideration: CR S2961; text: CR S2975-2976) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.5097 Amendment SA 5097 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2961) |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2460 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR1361 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1361 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.