US SB1091 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-07 - Became Public Law No: 115-196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-07 - Became Public Law No: 115-196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting Grandparents Raising Grandchildren Act (Sec. 3) This bill establishes an Advisory Council to Support Grandparents Raising Grandchildren. The council must identify, promote, coordinate, and publicly disseminate information and resources to help older relatives meet the needs of the children in their care and maintain their own health and emotional well-being. The council must report on the information and resources. The bill terminates the council after three years.
Title
Supporting Grandparents Raising Grandchildren Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-07 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-196. |
2018-07-07 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-06-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-06-22 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-06-21 | House | Senate agreed to the House amendments to S. 1091 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4351) |
2018-06-14 | House | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill. |
2018-06-13 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5131-5132) |
2018-06-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1091. |
2018-06-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5131-5133) |
2018-06-13 | House | Mr. Lewis (MN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-03-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1977-1978; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S1977-1978) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 343. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3105 (Same As) 2017-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Executive agency funding and structure
Families
Family relationships
Government information and archives
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Executive agency funding and structure
Families
Family relationships
Government information and archives